Hester v. Washington & Lee University
Plaintiff: Jared Hester
Defendant: Washington & Lee University
Case Number: 6:2022cv00002
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Received by mail - $402.00, receipt number 600002698. (ca)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If the filing fee is not paid within 14 days, the case will be dismissed. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/9/2022. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(al)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jared Hester. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(al)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER. Pursuant to Local Rule 3 of the Local Rules of the Western District of Virginia, Plaintiff in this matter is hereby ORDERED to show good cause, within seven (7) days of this Order, for his failure to timely tender his filing fee or submit an application to proceed without payment of the required filing fee. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/26/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(al)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:22-cv-00165. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/24/2022. (c/m 1/24/2022 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)[Transferred from Maryland on 1/24/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER ORDER regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/24/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/24/2022.]
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Washington & Lee University, filed by Jared Hester. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment, #3 Summons, #4 Envelope)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/24/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hester v. Washington & Lee University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington & Lee University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?