Reynolds v. Peeler
Plaintiff: Glen David Reynolds
Defendant: Mikel James Peeler
Case Number: 6:2022cv00058
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina.(Morris, Donald)
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mikel James Peeler. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 eSummons Issued to Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, #2 eSummons Issued to Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina)(ca) Main Document 5 replaced on 11/9/2022 due to clerical error; NEF regenerated. (ca)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina by Glen David Reynolds (Davis, Lauren) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/7/2022 with flattened .pdf version.) (ca)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Progressive Gulf Ins. Co. by Glen David Reynolds (Davis, Lauren) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/7/2022 with flattened .pdf version.) (ca)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Mikel James Peeler by Glen David Reynolds (Davis, Lauren) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/7/2022 with flattened .pdf version.) (ca)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mikel James Peeler (Filing & Administrative fee $402 receipt number AVAWDC-4045239), filed by Glen David Reynolds. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(al)
October 4, 2022 Macel H. Janoschka, in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by #updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (al)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen David Reynolds
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Davis
Represented By: Macel Hubbard Janoschka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikel James Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?