Shabazz v. Lokey et al
Case Number: 7:2014cv00457
Filed: August 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Jackson L. Kiser
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 102 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/24/2018. (tvt)
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/30/2017. (mf)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's claim pursuant to the Virginia Tort Claim Act without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1367(c)(4) without prejudice; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING ON PART 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendants' moti on for summary judgment is DENIED in part as to the federal religious claims against the defendants Lokey and Leatherwood and state law claim for detinue; and it is GRANTED in part as to the other claims and defendants. Signed by Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 5/22/2015. (slt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shabazz v. Lokey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?