Rountree v. Clarke et al
Case Number: 7:2015cv00220
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 61 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 4/28/2017. (tvt)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 58 Motion to Amend/Correct; The clerk shall STRIKE the case from the active docket of the court. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/16/2017. (tvt)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 38 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 4/15/2016. (slt)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Continue; granting 26 Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss; Defendants are DIRECTED to respond to plaintiff's pending requests for discovery 25 within 30 days; Plaintif f is GRANTED 60 days from entry of this order to amend her complaint to identify the defendants; Defendants shall respond to the complaint as amended within 30 days thereafter by filing an answer and any motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/25/2016. (tvt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rountree v. Clarke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?