Caldwell v. United Parcel Service
Case Number: 7:2015cv00358
Filed: June 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K. Dillon
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/10/2016. (am)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/2/2016. (am)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 10/20/2015. (lab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. United Parcel Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?