Clehm v. BAE Systems Ordinance Systems, Inc. et al

Case Number: 7:2016cv00012
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Michael F. Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2018 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 185 Motion to Dismiss, estopping Linkous from contesting liability as to the state law assault and battery claim alleged against him in Count II of the Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to schedule a one-day jury trial as to damages only as set forth in the order. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/6/18. (sas)
December 4, 2017 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 153 Motion for Summary Judgment, dismissing with prejudice Counts I, II (as to defendant BAI), III and IV are hereby Dismissed with prejudice, and BAE is Dismissed as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 12/1/17. (sas)
May 3, 2017 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/3/17. (sas)
March 21, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 120 Motion to Seal Exhibit 6 to 113 Motion. BAE is Directed to re-file exhibit 6 redacted within 14 days from the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 3/21/17. (sas)
July 22, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss Count II of complaint as it pertains to BAE, granting 25 Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint, and Directing defendants to file responsive pleadings to Count I and III of Amended Complaint on or before August 5, 2016. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 7/22/16. (sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clehm v. BAE Systems Ordinance Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?