Whitaker v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Case Number: 7:2017cv00055
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER denying as moot 155 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/12/19. (sas)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting 172 Motion in Limine and 173 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/8/19. (sas)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER denying 169 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/5/19. (sas)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 94 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Claims ONLY and dismissing with prejudice certain claims as set forth in the order; granting 80 Motion for Court to Take Judicial Notice of Public Records; denying 65 Motion to Exclude; denying 68 Motion in Exclude; denying 69 Motion in Exclude; denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/96/18. (sas)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 9 Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 20 Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/27/17. (sas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?