Edwards v. Schwartz et al

Plaintiff: Marc Edwards
Defendant: Melissa Mays, Yanna Lambrinidou and Paul Schwartz
Case Number: 7:2018cv00378
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 21 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . filed by Marc Edwards. (Denton, Jeremiah)
September 24, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #16 MOTION to Stay Discovery : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) ( Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2018 02:00 PM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski.), NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) ( Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2018 02:00 PM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski.) Dial in instructions emailed to counsel. (mka)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Oral ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alexander Davis Hawgood terminated. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/21/18. (mka)
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Yanna Lambrinidou, Melissa Mays, Paul Schwartz. (Hawgood, Arthur)
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Correction: Changed viewing restriction of Document #15 due to attorney attaching deficient pdf; only viewable by court personnel. Document correctly filed at Document #16 . (ck)
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Yanna Lambrinidou, Melissa Mays, Paul Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hawgood, Arthur)
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Yanna Lambrinidou, Melissa Mays, Paul Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Hawgood, Arthur)
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Cancellation of 10/9/18 Scheduling Conference Call (No Interpreter requested) (No Court Reporter Requested) (mka)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Yanna Lambrinidou, Melissa Mays, Paul Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Hawgood, Arthur)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Oral ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/30/18. (mka)
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Yanna Lambrinidou, Melissa Mays, Paul Schwartz. (Hawgood, Alexander)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Marc Edwards. (Denton, Jeremiah)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marc Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Denton, Jeremiah)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for William Moran II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William Moran, II for Yanna Lambrinidou, Melissa Mays and Paul Schwartz added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/23/2018. (ck)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2018 03:30 PM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Dial in instructions emailed to counsel. (mka)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 Scheduling Letter (mka)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for William Moran, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Yanna Lambrinidou, Melissa Mays, Paul Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hawgood, Alexander)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Yanna Lambrinidou, Melissa Mays, Paul Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1)(Hawgood, Alexander)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Montgomery County Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/7/2018. (ck)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ck)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number CL18001446-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt #0423-2948274), filed by Melissa Mays, Yanna Lambrinidou, Paul Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 State Court Waiver of Service, #4 Notice of Notice of Filing of Removal)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Schwartz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Edwards
Represented By: Jeremiah Andrew Denton, III
Represented By: Jeremiah Andrew Denton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Mays
Represented By: Alexander Davis Hawgood
Represented By: William Moran, II
Represented By: Arthur Phillip Hawgood, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanna Lambrinidou
Represented By: Alexander Davis Hawgood
Represented By: William Moran, II
Represented By: Arthur Phillip Hawgood, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Schwartz
Represented By: Alexander Davis Hawgood
Represented By: William Moran, II
Represented By: Arthur Phillip Hawgood, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?