Patrick v. Middle River Regional Jail et al
Plaintiff: William I. Patrick
Defendant: John Lilly and Middle River Regional Jail
Case Number: 7:2018cv00477
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with an Amended Complaint Responses due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 11/19/2018. (tvt)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Status of case by William I. Patrick. (Clerk mailing docket sheet; You will receive a copy of any relevant order/opinion as soon as the court issues it.) (slt)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff William I. Patrick (slt)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 10/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 9/27/2018. (tvt)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Account Report by William I. Patrick (tvt)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Assets by William I. Patrick (tvt)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against All Defendants, filed by William I. Patrick.(tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick v. Middle River Regional Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William I. Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middle River Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?