Doe v. Virginia Polytechnic Institute And State University et al
Plaintiff: Jack Doe
Defendant: Angela D Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute And State University, Katie Bylenga, Timothy Sands, Anthony Scott, Rohsaan Settle, Katie Reardon Polidoro and Caroline Green
Case Number: 7:2018cv00492
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym . filed by Jack Doe. (Binnall, Jesse)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym by Jack Doe. (Binnall, Jesse)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Andrew T. Miltenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg for Jack Doe added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/20/2018. (aab)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Tara J. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tara Jill Davis for Jack Doe added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/20/2018. (aab)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Andrew Miltenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3020385. by Jack Doe. (Binnall, Jesse)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Tara Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3020380. by Jack Doe. (Binnall, Jesse)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic summons issued as to Timothy Sands, #2 Electronic Summons issued as to Angela D. Simmons, #3 Electronic Summons as to Katie Reardon Polidoro, #4 Electronic Summons issued as to Rohsaan Settle, #5 Electronic Summons issued as to Katie Bylenga, #6 Electronic Summons issued as to Caroline Green, #7 Electronic Summons issued as to Anthony Scott)(aab)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400., receipt# 0423-2993545 ), filed by Jack Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/10/2018) (aab). Modified on 10/10/2018, civil cover sheet was replaced with correct pdf that had the correct case number (aab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Virginia Polytechnic Institute And State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela D Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Polytechnic Institute And State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Bylenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohsaan Settle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Reardon Polidoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Doe
Represented By: Jesse R. Binnall
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth York
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?