Doe v. Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Doe
Defendant: Aaron Reistad, Frances Keene, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Katie Reardon Polidoro, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University and Ennis McCrery
Case Number: 7:2018cv00523
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Winston Watts Burks, IV on behalf of Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (Burks, Winston)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Cabell Londos on behalf of Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (Londos, Katherine)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (Schnetzler, Nathan)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 12/18/2018. (aab)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. BallouMotions referred to Robert S. Ballou.. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/13/2018. (aab)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (McClanahan, Marvin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym . filed by Joseph Doe. (Binnall, Jesse)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym by Joseph Doe. (Binnall, Jesse)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Andrew T. Miltenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg for Joseph Doe added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/20/2018. (aab)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Tara J. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tara Jill Davis for Joseph Doe added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 11/20/2018. (aab)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Andrew Miltenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3020368. by Joseph Doe. (Binnall, Jesse)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Tara Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3020360. by Joseph Doe. (Binnall, Jesse)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Frances Keene, Ennis McCrery, Katie Reardon Polidoro, Aaron Reistad, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons issued as to Frank Shushok, #2 Electronic summons issued as to Katie Reardon Polidoro, #3 Electronic Summons issued as to Frances Keene, #4 Electronic Summons issued as to Ennis McCrery, #5 Electronic Summons issued as to Aaron Reistad)(aab)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400. receipt# 0423-3002534), filed by Joseph Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Reistad
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Keene
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sands
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Shushok, Jr.
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Reardon Polidoro
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ennis McCrery
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Doe
Represented By: Jesse R. Binnall
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth York
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?