Akers v. Micale et al
Appellant: Dale W Akers
Appellee: Farm Credit of the Virginias A.C.A, Christopher Micale and Skyline National Bank
Case Number: 7:2019cv00037
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Briefing Notice: Appellant Brief due by 3/23/2019. Appellee Brief due by 4/22/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 5/6/2019. (ck)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Designation of Record on Appeal; Bankruptcy Court case number 17-70584. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement, #8 Supplement, #9 Supplement, #10 Supplement, #11 Supplement, #12 Supplement, #13 Supplement, #14 Supplement) (Campbell, Pamela)
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Erb Jones on behalf of Christopher Micale (Jones, Rachel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court filed 01/17/19; Bankruptcy Court case number 17-70584 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Memorandum and Opinion, #3 Order, #4 USBC Docket Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akers v. Micale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dale W Akers
Represented By: Robert Tayloe Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Farm Credit of the Virginias A.C.A
Represented By: Bryson J. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christopher Micale
Represented By: Jason Brill Shorter
Represented By: Rachel Erb Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Skyline National Bank
Represented By: Mark L. Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?