Moore v. L Sly Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Moore
Defendant: L Sly Trucking, LLC and Maurice Dickey
Case Number: 7:2019cv00050
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Krozer Messersmith, IV on behalf of Maurice Dickey (Messersmith, John)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Maurice Dickey.(Messersmith, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against All Defendants, filed by Rebecca Moore.(Strickland, Arthur)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing #3 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/6/2019. (ck)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. filed by Rebecca Moore. (Strickland, Arthur)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT second against All Defendants, filed by Rebecca Moore.(Strickland, Arthur)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/18/2019. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/4/2019. (ck)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by Rebecca Moore.(Strickland, Arthur)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maurice Dickey, L Sly Trucking, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt # 0423-3057385), filed by Rebecca Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. L Sly Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Sly Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Dickey
Represented By: John Krozer Messersmith, IV
Represented By: Christopher Edward Bergin
Represented By: Katherine Beedie Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Moore
Represented By: Arthur Patrick Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?