O'Donnell v. Majors et al
Plaintiff: Charles Daniel O'Donnell
Defendant: Thomas Majors and Thomas Majors Trucking
Case Number: 7:2019cv00054
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 11:00 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Dial in instructions emailed to counsel. (mka)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Cancellation of PTM 4/2/19 @ 11am (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (mka)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Charles Daniel O'Donnell Agreed Order (Untiedt, Michael)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 WITHDRAWAL of Claim of Negligent Training by Charles Daniel O'Donnell. (Untiedt, Michael)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2019 11:00 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis P. Brumberg on behalf of Charles Daniel O'Donnell (Brumberg, Dennis)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Letter (mka)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Thomas Majors(individually ), Thomas Majors(d.b.a. Thomas Majors Trucking ), Thomas Majors Trucking. (Adams, Katherine)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thomas Majors(individually ), Thomas Majors(d.b.a. Thomas Majors Trucking ), Thomas Majors Trucking. (Adams, Katherine)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 State Court Records received from Circuit Court of Pulaski County, CL18-505 (aab)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Circuit Court of Pulaski County. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 01/29/2019. (aab)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thomas Majors(d.b.a. Thomas Majors Trucking ) (Adams, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thomas Majors Trucking (Adams, Katherine)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Pulaski County, case number CL18-505. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt# 0423-3058950), filed by Thomas Majors Trucking, Thomas Majors(individually ), Thomas Majors(d.b.a. Thomas Majors Trucking ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Donnell v. Majors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Daniel O'Donnell
Represented By: Michael Everett Untiedt
Represented By: Charles Paul Stanley, III
Represented By: Dennis P. Brumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Majors
Represented By: Katherine Beedie Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Majors Trucking
Represented By: Katherine Beedie Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?