Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC v. 2.93 Acres of Land, Owned by Lois King Waldron and Lois Mabel Waldron Martin
Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: 2.93 Acres of Land, Owned by Lois King Waldron and Lois Mabel Waldron Martin
Case Number: 7:2019cv00150
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles Malcolm Lollar and Charles Malcolm Lollar, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 3/26/2019. (ck)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by 2.93 Acres of Land, Owned by Lois King Waldron and Lois Mabel Waldron Martin. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sherman, Joseph)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Very Sherman on behalf of All Defendants (Sherman, Joseph)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 3/11/2019. (ck)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by 2.93 Acres of Land, Owned by Lois King Waldron and Lois Mabel Waldron Martin. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lollar, Charles) Modified on 3/8/2019 to correct docket text (ck).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting MVP access to Parcel No. VA-RO-057 to complete an appraisal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 2/25/2019. (ck)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 3:00 PM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou: Telephone Conference held on 2/20/2019. (cd)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/25-27/2019 09:30 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 2/8/2019. (ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC v. 2.93 Acres of Land, Owned by Lois King Waldron and Lois Mabel Waldron Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Represented By: Seth Michael Land
Represented By: Mark E. Frye
Represented By: Stephen M. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.93 Acres of Land, Owned by Lois King Waldron and Lois Mabel Waldron Martin
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Lollar, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Lollar
Represented By: Joseph Very Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?