Dillon v. B.T. Fitzpatrick,

Plaintiff: James Dillon
Defendant: B. T. Fitzpatrick, III
Case Number: 7:2019cv00193
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Dial in instructions emailed to counsel. (mka)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Letter (mka)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (sas)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by B. T. Fitzpatrick, III.(Harf, Julian)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Friedman Harf on behalf of B. T. Fitzpatrick, III (Harf, Julian)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Ethridge Carroll on behalf of B. T. Fitzpatrick, III (Carroll, Jeremy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on B.T. Fitzpatrick, III on March 19, 2019, filed by James Dillon.(Williams, Melvin)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to B. T. Fitzpatrick, III NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(aab)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by James Dillon as to James Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Williams, Melvin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B.T. Fitzpatrick, III (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3082446.), filed by James Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams) Modified on 2/25/2019 to correct party name (ams).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillon v. B.T. Fitzpatrick,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dillon
Represented By: Meghan Ashley Strickler
Represented By: Melvin E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. T. Fitzpatrick, III
Represented By: Jeremy Ethridge Carroll
Represented By: Julian Friedman Harf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?