Tahat v. Cuebas
Plaintiff: Amer N.M. Tahat
Defendant: Alejandri M. Cuebas
Case Number: 7:2019cv00197
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas V. McCarron on behalf of Alejandri M. Cuebas (Coules, Joseph) Modified on 4/24/2019 to correct docket text(ck).
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 State Court Records received from Montgomery County Circuit Court, CL18002447-00 (ck)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Montgomery County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 02/26/2019. (ams)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ams)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number CL18002447-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt number 0423-3083761), filed by Alejandri M. Cuebas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records, #2 Exhibit State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit Notice of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams) Modified on 2/26/2019 to correct document type (ams).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tahat v. Cuebas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amer N.M. Tahat
Represented By: Kristopher Robert Olin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandri M. Cuebas
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Coules
Represented By: Thomas Vincent McCarron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?