Floyd v. A Garcia Transport, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Floyd, Jr.
Defendant: Unberto R. Salinas-Perez, Rene Salinas, Rene Salinas Perez Unberto, John Doe, Unberto R. Salinas, Rene Salinas-Perez, Humberto Perez, A Garcia Transport, LLC,, Unberto R. Perez and A Garcia Transport, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00211
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 4/26/2019. (ams)
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by A Garcia Transport, LLC, Unberto R. Salinas-Perez. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Yates, Harry)
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendants A Garcia Transport, LLC, Unberto R. Salinas-Perez (Yates, Harry)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 through 4/2/2020 at 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs., Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/17/19. (mka)
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Scheduling Conference held on 4/17/2019. (mka)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul Carlton Rathke for Robert L. Floyd, Jr added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 04/15/2019. (ams)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2019 10:00 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Dial in instructions emailed to counsel. (mka)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Paul C. Rathke, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3119879. by Robert L. Floyd, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Jason)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Grace Miller on behalf of A Garcia Transport, LLC, Unberto R. Salinas-Perez (Miller, Mary)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Letter (mka)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ams)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by A Garcia Transport, LLC (Yates, Harry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by A Garcia Transport, LLC, Unberto R. Salinas-Perez.(Yates, Harry)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Unberto R. Salinas-Perez a/k/a Rene Salinas Perez Unberto, et al on 03/20/2019, filed by Robert L. Floyd, Jr.(ams) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/25/2019 to add file stamp) (ams).
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on A Garcia Transport on 03/20/2019, filed by Robert L. Floyd, Jr.(ams) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/25/2019 to add file stamp) (ams).
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert L. Floyd, Jr. A Garcia Transport, LLC served on 3/16/2019, answer due 4/8/2019.(Hart, Jason) Modified on 3/22/2019, to reflect correct service date (ams).
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to A Garcia Transport, LLC, NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to A Garcia Transport, LLC, c/o Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth, #2 Summons Issued as to Unberto R. Salinas-Perez, #3 Summons Issued as to Unberto R. Salinas-Perez c/o Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth)(ams)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A Garcia Transport, LLC,, Unberto R. Salinas-Perez (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt #0423-3089754.), filed by Robert L. Floyd, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd v. A Garcia Transport, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unberto R. Salinas-Perez
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Salinas
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Salinas Perez Unberto
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unberto R. Salinas
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Salinas-Perez
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humberto Perez
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Garcia Transport, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unberto R. Perez
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Garcia Transport, LLC
Represented By: Harry Robert Yates, III
Represented By: Mary Grace Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Floyd, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Hart
Represented By: Saul Geoffrey Glick
Represented By: Paul Carlton Rathke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?