Doe v. Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Doe
Defendant: Kyle Rose, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Angela Simmons, Timothy Sands, Frank Shushok, Jr., Rohsaan Settle, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro and Ennis McCrery
Case Number: 7:2019cv00249
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
June 25, 2020 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions via Zoom held on 6/11/2020 before Judge Ballou. Court Reporter/Transcriber JoRita Meyer, Telephone number 540-857-5100, ext. 5311, JoRitaM@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 7/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2020. (jm) Date of hearing corrected. Modified on 6/25/2020 (sad).
June 25, 2020 Filing 60 Financial arrangements made (Original) (14 calendar days Service) re #59 Transcript Request,, Transcript due by 6/25/2020. (jm)
June 11, 2020 Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (14 calendar days Service) by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University for Hearing - Motion for Protective Order held on 6/11/20 reported by Court Reporter FTR before Judge Hon. Robert S. Ballou. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Schnetzler, Nathan) Spelling correction made. Modified on 6/11/2020 (sad).JoRita Meyer to transcribe FTR. Modified on 6/12/2020 (sad).
June 11, 2020 Filing 58 Log Notes for a ZOOMGOV Video-conferenced Motion Hearing in the Roanoke Division held before Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/11/2020. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when re-played and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. Operator: K. Brown/ZOOMGOV (kab)
June 11, 2020 Filing 57 Minute Entry for a video-conferenced proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou: Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2020 re #52 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Scope of Discovery filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. ( Operator: K. Brown/ZOOMGOV) (kab)
June 3, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Scope of Discovery . filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
June 1, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE by Jacob Doe re #52 Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Doe v. University of the Sciences)(Binnall, Jesse)
May 26, 2020 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Scope of Discovery . filed by Jacob Doe. (Binnall, Jesse)
May 4, 2020 Filing 53 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #52 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Scope of Discovery . filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
May 4, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Scope of Discovery by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/26-30/2021 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2021 02:00 PM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. All other dates in #43 shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 4/14/2020. (ck) Modified on 4/16/2020 to correct date(ck).
April 13, 2020 Filing 50 Notice Rescheduling Hearing (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Final Pretrial Conference previously set for November 23, 2020 and July Trial set November 30-December 4, 2020 ----- Final Pretrial Conference set for April 19, 2021 at 2:00 PM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Jury Trial set for April 26-30, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (mf)
April 6, 2020 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou: Telephone Conference held on 4/6/2020. (rsb-lc1, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.(Schnetzler, Nathan)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Thus, Counts One, Two, Four, Five, and Six are dismissed, leaving only Does claim under Title IX against Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/19/2020. (ck)
March 19, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/19/2020. (ck)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #33 Motion Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym and denying #14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/18/2020. (ck)
March 18, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/18/2020. (ck)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER:Jury Trial set for 11/30-12/4/2020 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. All nondispositive pretrial motions and issues are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/19/2019. (ck)
December 18, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Final Pretrial Conference set for November 23, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Jury Trial set for November 30 - December 4, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (mf)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORAL ORDER granting #40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Winston Watts Burks, IV. terminated. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on December 3, 2019. (mf)
December 2, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Winston W. Burks, IV, by Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym . filed by Jacob Doe. (Davis, Tara)
July 10, 2019 Filing 38 Response re #33 MOTION Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym . filed by Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/2/2019. (ck)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 34 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #33 MOTION Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym . filed by Jacob Doe. (Davis, Tara)
June 26, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym by Jacob Doe. (Davis, Tara)
June 26, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Jacob Doe. (Davis, Tara)
June 26, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Jacob Doe. (Davis, Tara)
June 26, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) . filed by Jacob Doe. (Davis, Tara)
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Rule 16 Status Conference held on 6/25/2019. (ssm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Rule 16 Status Conference set for June 25, 2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone conference call before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers sent the dial-in information to the parties.)(mf)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORAL ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses to the pending motions to dismiss are due by 6/26/2019. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on June 10, 2019. (mf)
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 Scheduling Letter (bwd)
June 10, 2019 Filing 25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a), #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jacob Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER granting #22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg for Jacob Doe added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/4/2019. (ck)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORAL ORDER granting #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tara Jill Davis for Jacob Doe added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/4/2019. (ck)
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Andrew Miltenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3154796. by Jacob Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Tara Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3154791. by Jacob Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ck)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Marvin Hudson McClanahan on behalf of Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (McClanahan, Marvin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 10(a) by Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Winston Watts Burks, IV on behalf of Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (Burks, Winston)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Cabell Londos on behalf of Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (Londos, Katherine)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (Schnetzler, Nathan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Doe. Angela Simmons served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Davis, Tara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Doe. Ennis McCrery served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Davis, Tara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Doe. Frank Shushok, Jr served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Davis, Tara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Doe. Katie Polidoro served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Davis, Tara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Doe. Kelly Oaks served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Davis, Tara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Doe. Timothy Sands served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Davis, Tara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Doe. Rohsaan Settle served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Davis, Tara)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Doe. Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019.(Davis, Tara)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Ennis McCrery, #2 Summons Issued as to Angela Simmons, #3 Summons Issued as to Frank Shushok Jr., #4 Summons Issued as to Katie Polidoro, #5 Summons Issued as to Kelly Oaks, #6 Summons Issued as to Kyle Rose, #7 Summons Issued Rohsaan Settle, #8 Summons Issued as to Timothy Sands)(ams)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ennis McCrery, Kelly Oaks, Katie Polidoro, Kyle Rose, Timothy Sands, Rohsaan Settle, Frank Shushok, Jr, Angela Simmons, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt #0423-3101771.), filed by Jacob Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Rose
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Capaldo
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Capaldo
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Simmons
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Capaldo
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sands
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Capaldo
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Shushok, Jr.
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Capaldo
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohsaan Settle
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Capaldo
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Oaks
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Capaldo
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Polidoro
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Capaldo
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ennis McCrery
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Winston Watts Burks, IV
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Capaldo
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Represented By: Katherine Cabell Londos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Doe
Represented By: Jesse R. Binnall
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?