Meador v. Chapter 13 Trustee
Appellee: Chapter 13 Trustee
Appellant: Jeremy Allen Meador
Case Number: 7:2019cv00364
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Briefing Notice: Appellant Brief due by 7/31/2019. Appellee Brief due by 8/30/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/13/2019. (aab)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Designation of Record on Appeal; Bankruptcy Court case number 19-70501. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Record on Appeal) (Jenkins, Janet)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Roseboro Notice re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Deadline set for 7/1/2019. (aab)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Chapter 13 Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Shorter, Jason)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Correction: Document Number #1 was re-docketed as Document Number #2 to correct Docketing Event. (ams)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court filed 05/14/2019; Bankruptcy Court case number 19-70501 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Appeal, #2 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #3 Order Being Appealed, #4 USBC Docket Sheet)(ams)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jeremy Allen Meador. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal Statement of Election, #2 Notice of Filing Appeal, #3 Order Being Appealed, #4 USBC Docket Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meador v. Chapter 13 Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chapter 13 Trustee
Represented By: Jason Brill Shorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jeremy Allen Meador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?