Sheldon et al v. Nichols Transport Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Sheldon, Sandra Sheldon, Robert Sheldon and Christopher Sheldon
Defendant: Nichols Transport Company, Inc., David Howard Bennett and Chemsolv, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00398
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Christopher Sheldon, Robert Sheldon, Sandra Sheldon, Susan Sheldon. (Lyons, Gregory)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Nichols Transport Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cooley, John)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 6/27/2019. (ck)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin L. Fruchey for Nichols Transport Company, Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 06/17/2019. (aab)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard S. Baron for Nichols Transport Company, Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 06/17/2019. (aab)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for BENJAMIN L. FRUCHEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3165907. by Nichols Transport Company, Inc.. (Cooley, John)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Donald Porter Peery, Jr; Christopher Edward Bergin and John Krozer Messersmith, IV terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 06/17/2019. (aab)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Richard S. Baron, Esq. and Benjamin L. Fruchey, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3164478. by Nichols Transport Company, Inc.. (Cooley, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by David Howard Bennett. (Peery, Donald)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by David Howard Bennett (Essig, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Timothy Essig on behalf of David Howard Bennett (Essig, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion withdrawal of former counsel. Attorneys Carrol M. Ching, Esq. and Monica L. Mroz, Esq. terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 6/12/2019. (ck)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for withdrawal of former counsel by Christopher Sheldon, Robert Sheldon, Sandra Sheldon, Susan Sheldon. (Lyons, Gregory)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. 1-1) by Christopher Sheldon, Robert Sheldon, Sandra Sheldon, Susan Sheldon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed, #2 Exhibit Trust Document)(Lyons, Gregory)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Lyons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nichols Transport Company, Inc. (Cooley, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Roanoke City Circuit Court, CL16-1171 (ck)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Roanoke City Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 5/29/2019. (ck)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to Nichols Transport Company, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ams)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ams)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, case number CL16-1171. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt #0423-3150542), filed by Nichols Transport Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Records: Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Defendant Chemsolv Inc.s Plea in Bar to Plaintiffs Complaint, Motion for Admission Proc Hac Vice of Richard S. Baron and Benjamin L. Fruchev, Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Stipulated Protective Order,Plaintiffs Motion for Nonsuit Solely as to Defendant Chemsolv and Order of Nonsuit Solely as to Defendant Chemsolv, Inc., #2 Exhibit A State Court Records: Defendant Chemsolv Inc.'s Demurrer and Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit A State Court Records: Defendant Nichols Transport Company, Inc.'s Demurrer and Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit A State Court Records: Defendant David Howard Bennett's Demurrer and Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit B State Court Records:Order of Nonsuit Solely as to Defendant Chemsolv, Inc., #6 Exhibit C State Court Records: Roanoke County Police Department Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheldon et al v. Nichols Transport Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichols Transport Company, Inc.
Represented By: John Lester Cooley, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Lee Fruchey
Represented By: Richard Stephen Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Howard Bennett
Represented By: John Krozer Messersmith, IV
Represented By: Christopher Edward Bergin
Represented By: Michael Timothy Essig
Represented By: Donald Porter Peery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemsolv, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Lawrence Sarner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Sheldon
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Sheldon
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sheldon
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sheldon
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Represented By: Carrol Mullen Ching
Represented By: John Eric Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gregory Lee Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?