Cody v. Chapter 13 Trustee
Petitioner: City of Roanoke, Virginia
Appellee: Chapter 13 Trustee
Appellant: Linda Rene Cody
Case Number: 7:2019cv00433
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Appellee's BRIEF by David L Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Collins, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Appellee's BRIEF by Chapter 13 Trustee. (Shorter, Jason)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 07/17/2019. (aab)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Linda Rene Cody. Appellee Brief due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibits, #3 Driver License)(aab)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Reconsideration by Linda Rene Cody. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibits)(aab)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Briefing Notice: Appellant Brief due by 7/11/2019. Appellee Brief due by 8/12/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 8/26/2019. (aab)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court filed 06/11/2019; Bankruptcy Court case number 19-70043 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order Being Appealed, #3 USBC Docket Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cody v. Chapter 13 Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chapter 13 Trustee
Represented By: Christopher T. Micale
Represented By: Jason Brill Shorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Linda Rene Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Roanoke, Virginia
Represented By: Daniel J. Callaghan
Represented By: David Lee Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?