Miller v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Phillip Dean Miller
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Discover Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00436
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Anthony, David)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 07/12/2019. (aab)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Discover Financial Services, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ams)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Discover Financial Services, Inc., filed by Phillip Dean Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Discover Financial, Inc.)(Kelly, Kristi)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Shannon Nash on behalf of Phillip Dean Miller (Nash, Casey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Cahoon Kelly on behalf of Phillip Dean Miller (Kelly, Kristi)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Paper State Court Records received from Wythe County General District Court, GV19000468-00, consisting of 1 clipped volume, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (sas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Correction: Notice re: filing of Corporate Disclosure form docketed in error. (sas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Anthony, David)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from General District for the County of Wythe. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 06/12/2019. (ams)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ams)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (ams)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from General District Court of Wythe County, case number GV19000468-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3160567), filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Records Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Records Service of Process Documents, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Removal filed in State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Dean Miller
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?