Savage v. Commonwealth Assisted Living, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lisa S. Savage
Defendant: Commonwealth Assisted Living, LLC and MCAP Hillsville, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00444
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY LETTER re: Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosure and Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants by Lisa S. Savage.(Grimes, Terry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 In Chambers Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Status Conference held by conference call on 7/17/2019. (bwd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Rule 16 Status Conference set for July 17, 2019 at 3:00 PM by telephone conference call before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers will send the dial-in information to counsel.)(mf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Letter (bwd)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCAP Hillsville, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mayfair MCAP Associates, LLC, Corporate Parent Municipal Capital Appreciation Partners, III (VA), L.P. for MCAP Hillsville, LLC. (Holbrook, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commonwealth Assisted Living, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mayfair MCAP Associates, LLC, Corporate Parent Municipal Capital Appreciation Partners, III (VA), L.P. for Commonwealth Assisted Living, LLC. (Holbrook, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by Commonwealth Assisted Living, LLC, MCAP Hillsville, LLC.(Holbrook, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent for Commonwealth Assisted Living, LLC on 6/17/2019 by Lisa S. Savage. Waiver of Service due by 7/17/2019.(Grimes, Terry)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent for MCAP Hillsville, LLC on 6/17/2019 by Lisa S. Savage. Waiver of Service due by 7/17/2019.(Grimes, Terry)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth Assisted Living, LLC, MCAP Hillsville, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00. Receipt# 0423-3162621), filed by Lisa S. Savage. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savage v. Commonwealth Assisted Living, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Assisted Living, LLC
Represented By: Richard Bryan Holbrook
Represented By: Charles Garrison Meyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCAP Hillsville, LLC
Represented By: Richard Bryan Holbrook
Represented By: Charles Garrison Meyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa S. Savage
Represented By: Terry Neill Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?