Southern Coal Corporation v. Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Southern Coal Corporation
Defendant: Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00457
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Rule 16 Status Conference set for August 20, 2019 at 2:30 PM by telephone conference call before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers sent the dial-in instructions to the parties.)(mf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Letter (bwd)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss this Proceeding or, in the Alternative, Stay this Proceeding Pending Arbitration . filed by Southern Coal Corporation. (Houchens, Aaron)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Response due by 7/31/2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/12/19. (sas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Compel Arbitration by Southern Coal Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Houchens, Aaron)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard Alan Getty for Southern Coal Corporation added. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 07/10/2019. (ams)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Richard A. Getty to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3179548. by Southern Coal Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Houchens, Aaron)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Danielle Harlan for Southern Coal Corporation added. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 07/10/2019. (ams)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Danielle Harlan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3179011. by Southern Coal Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Houchens, Aaron)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Don C.A. Parker for Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company added. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 07/08/2019. (ams)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss this Proceeding or, in the Alternative, Stay this Proceeding Pending Arbitration . filed by Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company. (Hunter, Bryson)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss this Proceeding or, in the Alternative, Stay this Proceeding Pending Arbitration by Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hunter, Bryson)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Don C.A. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3176220. by Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunter, Bryson)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Exhibits and other filings served on Katie Bush on 6-24-2019, filed by Southern Coal Corporation.(Houchens, Aaron)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ams)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Coal Corporation. (ams)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3166281.), filed by Southern Coal Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Continuation)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Coal Corporation v. Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brickstreet Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Don C.A. Parker
Represented By: Bryson J. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Coal Corporation
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Represented By: Danielle Harlan
Represented By: Richard Alan Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?