Lawson et al v. FCA US, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Paulette Lawson and Lee Trinkle Lawson, Jr.
Defendant: FCA US, L.L.C. and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00484
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Oral ORDER regarding Stipulation #9 filed by FCA US, L.L.C. and directing the clerk to change the style of the case to read FCA US LLC by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/19/19. (mka)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION as to Change of Caption by FCA US, L.L.C. (Spencer, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings, LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V. for FCA US, L.L.C.. (Spencer, Christopher) (Main Document 8 replaced to be flattened on 8/1/2019) (aab).
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
July 31, 2019 Notice of Filing Requirement to FCA US, L.L.C. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by FCA US, L.L.C..(Spencer, Christopher)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael H. Kugler for Lee Trinkle Lawson, Jr.,Michael H. Kugler for Paulette Lawson added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 07/29/2019. (aab)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Michael H. Kugler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3190245. by Lee Trinkle Lawson, Jr, Paulette Lawson. (Ward, Donald)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on FCA US LLC on 07/11/2019, filed by Lee Trinkle Lawson, Jr, Paulette Lawson.(Ward, Donald)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to FCA US, L.L.C. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(aab)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US, L.L.C. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400., receipt# 0423-3176022), filed by Paulette Lawson, Lee Trinkle Lawson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson et al v. FCA US, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Lawson
Represented By: Donald Jack Ward, III
Represented By: William Andersen Jennings
Represented By: Christopher Shawn Potter
Represented By: Michael Hamilton Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Trinkle Lawson, Jr.
Represented By: Donald Jack Ward, III
Represented By: William Andersen Jennings
Represented By: Christopher Shawn Potter
Represented By: Michael Hamilton Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Christopher William Bascom
Represented By: Christopher Channing Spencer
Represented By: Mark Campbell Shuford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?