Thermasteel, Inc. v. Tulip Thermasteel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thermasteel, Inc. and Adi Ben-Senior
Defendant: Tulip Thermasteel, LLC, R.W. Day & Associates, Inc. and Robert W. Day
Case Number: 7:2019cv00492
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert W. Day, R.W. Day & Associates, Inc., Tulip Thermasteel, LLC, filed by Thermasteel, Inc., Adi Ben-Senior. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ams)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/08/2019. (ams)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct (File Amended Complaint) by Thermasteel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Scott, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Bankruptcy Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 07/10/2019. (aab)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Motion to Withdraw Reference. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-71461 by Thermasteel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Response in Opposition to Motion, #2 Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants Opposition to Motion)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thermasteel, Inc. v. Tulip Thermasteel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulip Thermasteel, LLC
Represented By: Mark Alan Black
Represented By: Dennis P. Brumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W. Day & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Alan Black
Represented By: Dennis P. Brumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Day
Represented By: Mark Alan Black
Represented By: Dennis P. Brumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thermasteel, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bird
Represented By: Richard Daniel Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adi Ben-Senior
Represented By: Timothy S. Bird
Represented By: Richard Daniel Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?