Nape v. Kells et al
Plaintiff: Steven William Nape
Defendant: Edward Lee Kells and Averitt Express, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00517
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 2/24/2020 Jury Trial set for 4/2-4/3/2020 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Discovery due by 2/17/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 09/16/2019. (ssm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 4/2-4/3/2020 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (Scheduling Order to follow) (ssm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Letter (ssm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Averitt Express, Inc. (Moyers, Jason)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Averitt Express, Inc. on 7/30/2019, filed by Steven William Nape.(Bowers, Les)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Edward Lee Kells on 7/27/2019, filed by Steven William Nape.(Bowers, Les) Modified docket text on 8/7/2019 to correctly reflect service date of 7/27/2019 instead of 7/26/2019.(sas).
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (sas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Requirement to Averitt Express, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (sas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint #1 with JURY DEMAND by Averitt Express, Inc. and Edward Lee Kells.(Moyers, Jason) Modified on 8/5/2019 to reflect Edward Lee Kells as a filer (sas).
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Correction: Changed viewing restriction of Document #2 due to attorney attaching incorrect/deficient pdf; only viewable by court personnel. Document correctly filed at document #3 . (sas)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Averitt Express, Inc., Edward Lee Kells NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Averitt Express, Inc.)(sas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Steven William Nape as to Edward Lee Kells.(Bowers, Les)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Steven William Nape as to Averitt Express, Inc..(Bowers, Les)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Steven William Nape as to Averitt Express, Inc..(Bowers, Les)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Averitt Express, Inc., Edward Lee Kells (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3189346.), filed by Steven William Nape.(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nape v. Kells et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lee Kells
Represented By: Jason Guy Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Averitt Express, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Guy Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven William Nape
Represented By: Les S. Bowers
Represented By: Edward Kyle McNew
Represented By: Robert Edward Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?