Kessing v. Western Virginia Regional Jail et al
Plaintiff: Derick Christopher Kessing
Defendant: Sgt. Fadorick, Captain Hiner, Lt. Scott, Western Virginia Regional Jail, Officer Jones and Officer Hemlick
Case Number: 7:2019cv00546
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: re #6 Response regarding Derick Kessing; (No forwarding address given) (ck)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address and request for update on case by Derick Christopher Kessing (sas) (Clerk mailing docket sheet. Plaintiff will receive a copy of any opinion and/or order as the court issue it.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: re #6 Response regarding Derick Christopher Kessing; (No forwarding address given) (slt)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Response letter to Plaintiff re #5 Additional Evidence. filed by Derick Christopher Kessing. (slt)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Additional Evidence by Derick Christopher Kessing (slt)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Derick Christopher Kessing (slt)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/7/2019. (slt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report and Statement of Assets by Derick Christopher Kessing. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(sas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sgt. Fadorick, Officer Hemlick, Captain Hiner, Officer Jones, Lt. Scott, Western Virginia Regional Jail, filed by Derick Christopher Kessing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessing v. Western Virginia Regional Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick Christopher Kessing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Fadorick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Hiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Virginia Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hemlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?