LittleJohn v. Arritt et al
Plaintiff: Ma'aguil Ni'Mill LittleJohn and Ma'aquil Ni'Mill LittleJohn
Defendant: Officer B. Arritt, University of Virginia Medical Center and Albemarle Police Department
Case Number: 7:2019cv00553
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Response re #9 Letter requesting legal advice. (aab)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Letter requesting legal advice by Ma'aquil Ni'Mill LittleJohn. (aab)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Ma'aquil Ni'Mill LittleJohn (aab)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Letter regarding name incorrectly spelled by Ma'aquil Ni'Mill LittleJohn. (Clerk corrected docket sheet to correctly reflect plaintiffs name from complaint). (aab)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/28/2019. (slt)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Ma'aguil Ni'Mill LittleJohn (slt)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983;Regarding Prisoner Trust Account (JULY); Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/9/2019. (slt)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) by Ma'aguil Ni'Mill LittleJohn (slt)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Assets by Ma'aguil Ni'Mill LittleJohn. (aab)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Albemarle Police Department, Officer B. Arritt, University of Virginia Medical Center, filed by Ma'aguil Ni'Mill LittleJohn.(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LittleJohn v. Arritt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ma'aguil Ni'Mill LittleJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ma'aquil Ni'Mill LittleJohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer B. Arritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Virginia Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albemarle Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?