Mongold v. Nicholson et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Allen Mongold
Defendant: Middle River Regional Jail, Maj. Lori Nicholson and Maj. Eric Young
Case Number: 7:2019cv00567
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: re #6 Order Dismissing Case regarding Wayne Allen Mongold; (No forwarding address given) (ck)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Order and/or Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party). Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/12/2019. (slt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable-"No longer incarcerated at Middle River Regional Jail": re #4 Order regarding Wayne Allen Mongold; (No forwarding address given) (ck)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 9/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/19/2019. (slt)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Assets by Wayne Allen Mongold (sas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wayne Allen Mongold. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (sas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Middle River Regional Jail, Lori Nicholson, Eric Young, filed by Wayne Allen Mongold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C, #2 Envelope)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mongold v. Nicholson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middle River Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maj. Lori Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maj. Eric Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Allen Mongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?