Dale v. Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Plaintiff: Valerie Dale
Defendant: Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00578
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Valerie Dale, Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (ck)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ck)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Wimbish, Carlyle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ck)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Roanoke City Circuit Court, case number CL19-569. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt #0423-321167), filed by Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale v. Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Dale
Represented By: John Saul Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Lyn Rowling Warden
Represented By: Carlyle R. Wimbish, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?