Mundy v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marla Mundy
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00656
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/18/2019. (ssm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. - located at Docket Entry #6 State Court Record at page #10 (sas)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Paper State Court Records received from Montgomery County General District Court, GV19-2846, consisting of 1 clipped volume, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (sas)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from General District Court for Montgomery County. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 09/27/2019. (ams)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company for United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Delano, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (sas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (sas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County General District Court, case number GV19002846-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt #0423-3236632), filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #2 state court records - Warrant in Debt, Complaint and Bill of Particulars, #3 Answer to Complaint) (sas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mundy v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Barnes Delano, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Mundy
Represented By: Christopher Stanislaw Dadak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?