Payne v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frederica Payne
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Case Number: 7:2019cv00666
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:2605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Scheduling Conference set for 12/24/2019 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Dial in instructions emailed to counsel. (mka)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Letter (mka)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (sas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, NA identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Nader, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Nader, John)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, NA.(Nader, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, NA)(ams)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, NA (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3239093.), filed by Frederica Payne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederica Payne
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Patrick Ryan Kelly
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: John Alexander Nader
Represented By: Alfred Dumetz Carry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: John Alexander Nader
Represented By: Alfred Dumetz Carry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?