Neal v. Warden, USP Lee
Petitioner: Denard Darnell Neal
Respondent: United States Penitentiary Lee and Warden, USP Lee
Case Number: 7:2019cv00699
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINAL ORDER granting #4 Motion to Voluntary Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/2/2019. (slt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss by Denard Darnell Neal. (ck)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Service pursuant to Section 28 U.S.C. 2241 upon respondents re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Denard Darnell Neal. The parties are advised that petitioner's contentions in the petition alleging retaliation and other prison conditions claims will not be addressed in this habeas corpus action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/13/2019. (tvt)
October 29, 2019 Filing Fee Received $ 5, receipt number 7-61935 (ck)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with filing fee or Consent to Fee form within 21 days. Responses due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/21/2019. (slt)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Denard Darnell Neal. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Warden, USP Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Penitentiary Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, USP Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Denard Darnell Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?