Holmes v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Peggy Holmes
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 7:2019cv00736
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/18/2019. (ssm)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #5 State Court Record at page# 34 by Life Insurance Company of North America. (ams) Modified on 11/18/2019 to correct page number of answer (ams).
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, CL1900179800. (ams)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from City of Roanoke Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/08/2019. (ssm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ams)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America. (ams)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, case number CL1900179800. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3261876), filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Records: Complaint and praecipe, #2 Exhibit A State Court Records: Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: David E. Constine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Holmes
Represented By: Michael A. Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?