CHS Inc. v. ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: CHS Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Rectors and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Case Number: 7:2019cv00788
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Scheduling Letter (bwd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ABM Industries, Inc. for ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.. (McGavin, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Requirement to ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ck)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Rectors and Visitors of the University of Virginia, filed by ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract)(McGavin, John)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc..(McGavin, John)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHS Inc.. ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019.(Rottenborn, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ck)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHS Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Carilion Clinic for CHS Inc.. (ck)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt # 0423-3276958), filed by CHS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHS Inc. v. ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc.
Represented By: John David McGavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Guilbert Perrow
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rectors and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?