Elswick v. Stanley et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Seth Houchins Elswick
Defendant: Major J.R. Stanley, Captain K. Ulrich and Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority Tazwelle Facility
Case Number: 7:2019cv00815
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/3/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 OPINION. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/3/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order for Plaintiff to Respond within ten (10) days of this Order's entry, by paying the $350.00 filing fee for this action or to otherwise respond to this Order. Failure to pay this amount in full or otherwise respond to this Order within the time allowed shall result in the immediate dismissal of this action without prejudice. Responses due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/14/2020. (slt)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Seth Houchins Elswick: P.O. Box 806, Raven Virginia 24639. (aab)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Seth Houchins Elswick: 115 Court Street, Tazewell, Virginia 24651. (aab)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Joseph Seth Houchins Elswick (slt)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 1/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/16/2019. (tvt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Joseph Seth Houchins Elswick (tvt)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account (Six-month statements); Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/9/2019. (slt)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Joseph Seth Houchins Elswick (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(aab)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority Tazwelle Facility, J.R. Stanley, K. Ulrich, filed by Joseph Seth Houchins Elswick.(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elswick v. Stanley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Seth Houchins Elswick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major J.R. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain K. Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority Tazwelle Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?