Lucas v. BH Media Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Candace M. Lucas
Defendant: Lee Enterprises, Inc. and BH Media Group, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00112
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Oral ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/3/20. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consent Motion for Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by BH Media Group, Inc. Lee Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzgerald, Shannan) Modified on 4/3/2020 Docket text was modified to reflect additional filer Lee Enterprises, Inc.(sas).
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Johneal Moore White on behalf of Lee Enterprises, Inc. (White, Johneal)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Marie Fitzgerald on behalf of BH Media Group, Inc. (Fitzgerald, Shannan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren David Harless on behalf of BH Media Group, Inc. (Harless, Warren)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. BH Media Group, Inc. answer due 4/3/2020; Lee Enterprises, Inc. answer due 4/3/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 3/10/2020. (sas)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint from March 11, 2020, to April 3, 2020 by BH Media Group, Inc., Lee Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fisher White, Lauren)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lee Enterprises, Inc. on February 20, 2020, filed by Candace M. Lucas.(Haddox, Brittany)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on BH Media Group, Inc. on February 19, 2020, filed by Candace M. Lucas.(Haddox, Brittany)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to BH Media Group, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Lee Enterprises, Inc.)(ams)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BH Media Group, Inc., Lee Enterprises, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3332045.), filed by Candace M. Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. BH Media Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Fisher White
Represented By: Johneal Moore White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Fisher White
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Warren David Harless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace M. Lucas
Represented By: Norvell Winston West, IV.
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Haddox
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?