Clifton v. Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator
Plaintiff: Jimmy Jack Clifton
Defendant: Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator
Case Number: 7:2020cv00350
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/11/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/11//2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER: By order entered July 13, 2020, the court conditionally filed this action, directed Clifton to file an amended complaint, and enclosed a form for the amended complaint. See ECF No. 5. On July 29, 2020, the court received the first page of the form back, but it was submitted by another inmate and makes allegations which are both nonsensical and have nothing to do with this case. Inasmuch as the document was not submitted by Clifton and is unrelated to this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the document (ECF No. 6) is STRICKEN from the record of this case and will not be considered by the court.. Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/10/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 STRICKEN PER ORDER #7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator, filed by Dewayne Helton.(ck) Modified on 8/10/2020 (tvt).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with an Amended Complaint within 14 days. Responses due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 7/13/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Jimmy Jack Clifton (ck)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report and Statement of Assets by Jimmy Jack Clifton (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(ck)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator, filed by Jimmy Jack Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifton v. Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Jack Clifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?