Miller v. United States of America
Petitioner: TYREE MILLER
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 7:2020cv00412
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/24/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/24/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 2241; Regarding Statement of Assets;Consent to Fee; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 8/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 7/27/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02722. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2020 Original record transferred to the Western District of Virginia via interdistict transfer system. (md, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order #3 mailed to Miller. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE INSTANT PETITION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA WHERE MILLER IS CURRENTLY INCARCERATED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/6/20. 7/7/20 ENTERED. PRO SE NOT MAILED.(va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TYREE MILLER (NO FEE; NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TYREE MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?