Curtis v. Commonwealth of Virginia
Petitioner: Clay Marshall Curtis
Respondent: Commonwealth of Virginia
Case Number: 7:2020cv00414
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail (slt)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response to Petition #1 due by 9/24/2020 Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/13/20. (Order to be mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(PMS)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Order of Prisoner Service (2254), by Commonwealth of Virginia. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Johnson, Victoria)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Lee Johnson on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (Johnson, Victoria)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 Acknowledgment of Receipt as to #9 Order of Prisoner Service (2254), filed by Commonwealth of Virginia.(Johnson, Victoria)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of Service pursuant to Section 28 U.S.C. 2254 upon respondents re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Clay Marshall Curtis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/22/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00224. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2020 Case transferred to District of Western District of VA. Original file electronically transmitted. (afar) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER: It is ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be, and hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Petitioner and to effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 7/16/20. (afar) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. It is ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Petitioner must accomplish one of the following actions: 1. Remit $5.00 filing fee. 2. Complete and submit to the Clerk of this Court an "Affidavit in Support of Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis." The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner along with an application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 6/11/2020. Copies mailed 6/12/2020.(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 24683045671. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 Submission by Petitioner. Request for information. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED Petition against Commonwealth of Virginia, filed by Clay Marshall Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/6/2020) (jmey, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION, Conditionally filed (SUBJECT TO DEFECT) for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Clay Marshall Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clay Marshall Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Victoria Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?