Barre et al v. DCN Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nelson Barre and Danielle Barre
Defendant: DCN Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00416
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by DCN Holdings, Inc. (ams)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Oral ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ingmar Goldson for Danielle Barre,Ingmar Goldson for Nelson Barre added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/27/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(aab)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Ingmar Goldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3445995. by Danielle Barre, Nelson Barre. (Thomas, Diana)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to DCN Holdings, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ams)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DCN Holdings, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt number 0423-3441165.), filed by Nelson Barre and Danielle Barre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barre et al v. DCN Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Barre
Represented By: Diana Margeaux Thomas
Represented By: Ingmar Bancroft Goldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Barre
Represented By: Diana Margeaux Thomas
Represented By: Ingmar Bancroft Goldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCN Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?