Gassew v. USP Lee County Penitentiary et al
Plaintiff: John Gassew
Defendant: USP Lee County Penitentiary, FBOP and Unknown Warden of the Prison
Case Number: 7:2020cv00491
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/22/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/22/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by John Gassew. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (tvt)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC Section 1331 Bivens Act; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/19/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00439. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (shea) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing that this acting be and is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia; directing that plaintiff direct all future filings to the Clerk's Office for the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia; directing that the Clerk transfer all filings in this civil action and a copy of the docket sheet to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia; directing the Clerk to close this civil action. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 8/18/2020. (c/m 8/18/2020 shea) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Petition to Add Names by John Gassew. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Petition to Add Names by John Gassew. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 Petition to Add Names by John Gassew. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Petition to Add Names to the Petitioners Case Load by John Gassew. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2020.] Modified on 8/19/2020 (slt).
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to waive or excuse filing fees by John Gassew. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt letter sent to John Gassew. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FBOP, USP Lee County Penitentiary, Unknown Warden of the Prison (Filing fee $ 400., not paid), filed by John Gassew. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Database Form, #2 Envelope)(acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gassew v. USP Lee County Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP Lee County Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Warden of the Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gassew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?