Sawyer v. Carlton
Plaintiff: Larry T. Sawyer
Defendant: Howard Carlton, Southern West of Virginia Regional Jail, Medical Dept and SWVRJA
Case Number: 7:2020cv00510
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
2 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Larry T. Sawyer: Laurel County Detention Center, 440 Hammock Road, London, Kentucky 40744. Clerk mailing copy of document #20 to Plaintiff at updated address. (aab)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/19/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: re #17 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel regarding Larry T. Sawyer; (No forwarding address given) (slt)
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: re #15 Order Prisoner Service - (1983 or Bivens), regarding Larry T. Sawyer; (No forwarding address given) (slt)
October 6, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/5/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Howard Carlton on 10/2/2020. (Service paperwork mailed to Defendant(s) at Local Facility) Waiver of Service due by 11/2/2020.(slt)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants Howard Carlton re #12 Amended Complaint filed by Larry T. Sawyer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/2/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Larry T. Sawyer. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (slt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 Prisoner Trust Account Report and statement of Assets by Larry T. Sawyer (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(slt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Howard Carlton, filed by Larry T. Sawyer.(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2020: #1 Attachment) (slt).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Oral ORDER-It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension (Dkt. No. 10) is GRANTED. If Sawyer chooses to file an amended complaint in this case, he should do so not later than November 16, 2020. Also, plaintiff's motion for extension included a sealed order from his criminal case. A review of the docket in that case confirms that the order remains under seal. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to file that attachment (Dkt. No. 10-1) under seal until further order of this court. Responses due by 11/16/2020 Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/24/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Order Dismissing Case by Larry T. Sawyer. (#1 Copy of Order from TNED)Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (slt) Modified on 9/24/2020-per staff attorney-order placed under seal.(slt).
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Norman K. Moon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/8/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail) Modified on 9/23/2020 to add docket text-If Sawyer chooses to file an amended complaint, he shall have thirty days from the entry of this order to do so. If no amended complaint is filed within thirty days, the Clerk shall STRIKE this case from the active docket of the court without further order. (slt)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/8/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Larry T. Sawyer (aab)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/25/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/25/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Larry T. Sawyer (ck)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Larry T. Sawyer. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (ck)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Howard Carlton, Medical Dept, Southern West of Virginia Regional Jail, filed by Larry T. Sawyer.(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern West of Virginia Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWVRJA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry T. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?