Abdullah v. Kumer et al
Plaintiff: Angel Abdulsami Abdullah
Defendant: Sergeant Taylor, 1st Lt. Schmittinger, Corpal Hayden, Major Barnaber, Captain Carver and Superintedent Martin Kumer
Case Number: 7:2020cv00544
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
2 Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
3 Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Angel Abdulsami Abdullah. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (aab)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kumer, et al on 10/29/2020. (Service paperwork mailed to Defendant(s) at Following address Albermarle Charlottesville Regional Jail, 160 Peregory Lane, Charlottesville, VA 22903 ) Waiver of Service due by 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice and waiver-Captain Carver, #2 Notice and waiver-Corpal Hayden, #3 Notice and waiver-Major Barnaber, #4 Notice and waiver-Sergeant Taylor, #5 Notice and waiver-Superintedent Martin Kumer)(slt)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants Barnaber, Carver, Hayden, Martin Kumer, Schmittinger, Taylor re #1 Complaint filed by Angel Abdulsami Abdullah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 10/29/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Angel Abdulsami Abdullah. (aab)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 Letter regarding not receiving six month statements from accounting office by Angel Abdulsami Abdullah. (aab)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 10/19/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Angel Abdulsami Abdullah. (aab)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Thomas T. Cullen and Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou for all further proceedings. Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon and Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 10/8/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 6, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 Response re #6 Prisoner Trust Account Report .. (tvt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) by Angel Abdulsami Abdullah (tvt)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with the six month statements (March-August) within 20 days. Responses due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/28/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) by Angel Abdulsami Abdullah. (Clerk sending docket sheet.) (slt)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/11/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Assets by Angel Abdulsami Abdullah (aab)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Barnaber, Carver, Hayden, Martin Kumer, Schmittinger, Taylor, filed by Angel Abdulsami Abdullah.(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdullah v. Kumer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Abdulsami Abdullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Lt. Schmittinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corpal Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Barnaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintedent Martin Kumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?