Johnson v. McCowan
Plaintiff: Corey E. Johnson
Defendant: (K-9) Officer McCowan
Case Number: 7:2020cv00582
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
2 Judge: Joel C Hoppe
3 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Officer McCowan. Officer McCowan waiver sent on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020.(Davis, Timothy)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Edward Davis on behalf of Officer McCowan (Davis, Timothy)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 11/3/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Corey E. Johnson. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (aab)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Service (OAG 1983) sent to (K-9) Officer McCowan on 10/19/2020. Pursuant to the agreement of electronic service. Waiver of Service due by 11/18/2020.(slt)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants Officer McCowan re #1 Complaint filed by Corey E. Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 10/19/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Corey E. Johnson (aab)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Pursuant to STANDING ORDER 2020-16, the U.S. Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou is referred to this case. Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe no longer assigned to the case. (tvt)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Thomas T. Cullen for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/30/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 10/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/29/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report and statement of Assets with IFP Application by Corey E. Johnson (tvt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against (K-9) Officer McCowan, filed by Corey E. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. McCowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (K-9) Officer McCowan
Represented By: Timothy Edward Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?