Bowman v. Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Gary M. Bowman
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. and United Bank for Africa PLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv00586
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
2 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 28 Certificate of Compliance by Gary M. Bowman, re #21 Electronic Summons Issued(sas)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Oral ORDER withdrawing #5 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff filed notice of his intent to withdraw this motion. EFC No. 8. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/20/20. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Oral ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to motion to dismiss, ECF No. 23. Responses due by 12/4/2020 Replies due by 12/31/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/18/20. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
November 18, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gary M. Bowman. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Bowman, Gary)
November 10, 2020 Filing 24 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rainsbury, Joseph)
November 10, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Citibank, N.A.. (Rainsbury, Joseph)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas T. Cullen no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 11/6/2020. (ck)
October 29, 2020 Filing 21 Electronic Summons Issued as to United Bank for Africa PLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(sas)
October 28, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Summons for UNITED BANK FOR AFRICA PLC by Gary M. Bowman (Bowman, Gary) (Main Document 20 replaced on 10/29/2020) (sas). Modified on 10/29/2020 Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (sas).
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 Response re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and failure to join necessary party , RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and failure to join necessary party . filed by Gary M. Bowman. (Bowman, Gary)
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gary M. Bowman.(Bowman, Gary)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/15/20. (kld)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Oral ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant's motion to dismiss by October 27, 2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/15/20. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Thomas T. Cullen for all further proceedings. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski and Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Joel C. Hoppe.Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/13/2020. (sas)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, CL20002026-00. (ams)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Citibank, N.A.. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rainsbury, Joseph)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and failure to join necessary party by Gary M. Bowman. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Bowman, Gary)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Motions referred to Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/8/20. (mka)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and failure to join necessary party . filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rainsbury, Joseph)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and failure to join necessary party by Citibank, N.A.. (Rainsbury, Joseph)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Gary M. Bowman re #5 of Withdrawal of his Motion to Compel Federal Express Corporation to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum (Bowman, Gary)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citibank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citicorp LLC, Corporate Parent Citigroup, Inc. for Citibank, N.A.. (Rainsbury, Joseph)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Corrected Certificate of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum issued to Federal Express Corporation) by Gary Michael Bowman on behalf of Gary M. Bowman (Bowman, Gary)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Federal Express Corporation to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum by Gary M. Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Subpoena Duces Tecum, #2 Exhibit B--Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C--Declaration of Gary M. Bowman)(Bowman, Gary)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Requirement to Citibank, N.A. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (dg)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (dg)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from City of Roanoke Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 09/30/2020. (dg)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of Roanoke Circuit Court, case number CL20-2026. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3499582.), filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary M. Bowman
Represented By: Gary Michael Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph M. Rainsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Bank for Africa PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?