Lawson v. Cantrell et al
Plaintiff: Michael David Lawson
Defendant: James Wade and C. Cantrell
Case Number: 7:2020cv00623
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 10/23/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00627. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2020 Case transferred to Western District of Virginia - Roanoke Division. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (pmil, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/23/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Roanoke Division; plaintiff direct all future filings to the Clerk's Office for the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Roanoke Division (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/23/20. (c/s: pltf)(pmil, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/23/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael David Lawson (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/23/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (mailed to pltf) (pmil, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/23/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 VERIFIED STATEMENT by Michael David Lawson. (pmil, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/23/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Michael David Lawson. (pmil, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/23/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against C. Cantrell, James Wade filed by Michael David Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Data Report, #2 Envelope)(pmil, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Cantrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael David Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?