Willis v. Adult Detention Center
Plaintiff: Timothy Brooks Willis, Jr.
Defendant: Adult Detention Center
Case Number: 7:2020cv00757
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
2 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/18/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/18/2021. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 2/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/19/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Timothy Brooks Willis, Jr (slt)( Both Case numbers 720cv00758 and 720cv00757 listed on document.)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 Letter requesting copies of Trust Account Form by Timothy Brooks Willis, Jr (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SEE DE#5)(slt)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 2/1/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/8/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Copy of forms as to #3 Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed,, by Timothy Brooks Willis, Jr. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (slt)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 30 days Responses due by 1/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 12/22/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Timothy Brooks Willis, Jr (tvt)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Adult Detention Center, filed by Timothy Brooks Willis, Jr.(tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Brooks Willis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?